+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
- Assigned to State Government
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
- Referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 117-000-000
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2019: HJR0076 - Motion To Adopt
May 30, 2019: HJR0076 - State Government
May 27, 2019: HJR0076
May 22, 2019: HJR0076 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor