+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: HR0756 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor