+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On November 1, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
On October 11, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On October 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 2, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the heading. Urges the State Board of Education to work with school districts to ensure compliance with school safety policies and protocols and resolves that the State Board recommend any other changes necessary to enhance the safety of the State's schools.