+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-004-000
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios