+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
+ − Vote
February 20, 2019: HR0074 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor