+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Vote
April 18, 2018: HR0729 - Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor