+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 030-000-000
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: HR0719 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor