+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Vote
March 23, 2022: HR0701 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor