+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-000-000
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper