+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-012-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers