+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: HR0007 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor