+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 018-000-000
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: HJR0069 - Wednesday, February 26, 2014
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor