+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 092-000-000
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Votes (2)
August 5, 2015: HR0641 - Wednesday, August 05, 2015
July 28, 2015: HR0641 - Elem Sec Ed School Curricu Policies - Jul 28, 2015
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor