+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
+ − Vote
April 27, 2021: HR0064 - Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor