+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
+ − Vote
March 16, 2022: HR0639 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor