+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Vote
May 30, 2004: HR0635 - Sunday, May 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor