+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 1, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 105-000-000
On July 31, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Environmental Health Committee; 009-000-000
On July 25, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environmental Health Committee
On July 16, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole
+ − Vote
August 1, 2007: HR0602 - Wednesday, August 01, 2007
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor