+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 29, 2011 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On November 28, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
On November 10, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On November 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 27, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor