+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 022-000-000
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
+ − Vote
February 26, 2015: HR0059 - Veterans' Affairs - Feb 26, 2015
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor