+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
+ − Vote
March 23, 2022: HR0585 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor