+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 30, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-000-000
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On November 21, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor