+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 012-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: HR0058 - Prescription Drug Affordability
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor