+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart