+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Executive Committee; 007-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Corrects a date.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
November 13, 2019: HR0577 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor