+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On December 5, 2012 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
- Resolution Adopted 110-000-001
On December 4, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
On November 28, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On July 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond
+ − Vote
December 5, 2012: HJR0057 - Wednesday, December 05, 2012
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor