+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor