+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 016-000-000
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe