+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 27, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Rules Committee
On July 25, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On June 27, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On June 22, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Dunn
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
- Co-Sponsor Rep. James H. Meyer
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron Schock
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor