+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On August 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On July 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine