+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Arrive in Senate
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 091-000-000
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; 007-000-000
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly