+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On November 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor