+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 049-000-000
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015
- Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 113-000-000
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2015: HJR0051 - Motion To Adopt - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 12, 2015: HJR0051 - Transportation - May 12, 2015
April 28, 2015: HJR0051 - Tuesday, April 28, 2015
April 21, 2015: HJR0051 - Transportation, Regulation, Roads - Apr 21, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor