+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 17, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On June 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On June 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor