+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 17, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Resolution Adopted 100-000-000
On June 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-001-001
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos