+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Rules; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On May 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 11, 2008
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Re-referred to Rules
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On July 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions July 26, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On July 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On June 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 098-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor Committee; 017-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor Committee
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
June 21, 2007: HJR0049 - Thursday, June 21, 2007
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor