+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford