+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On October 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On October 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On June 29, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor