+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor