+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On June 1, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor