+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
- Arrive in Senate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 115-000-000
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2019: HJR0046 - Motion To Adopt
May 15, 2019: HJR0046
April 30, 2019: HJR0046 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor