+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 19, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On November 20, 2003 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Shane Cultra
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Art Tenhouse
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard P. Myers
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor