+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 31, 2005 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 30, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
On May 29, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe