+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-000-001
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
+ − Vote
June 22, 2017: HR0445 - Appropriations-Human Services
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor