+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Silvana Tabares
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: HR0439 - Labor & Commerce Committee - May 28, 2015
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor