+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Environmental Health Committee; 007-000-000
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environmental Health Committee
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor