+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor