+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps