+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth