+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor