+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel